NJ A2014 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1944
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Automatically registers to vote and updates voter registration for eligible person when applying for motor vehicle driver's license, or non-driver identification card.*
Title
Automatically registers to vote and updates voter registration for eligible person when applying for motor vehicle driver's license, or non-driver identification card.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S481 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.6. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Motion To Table (23-11) (Ruiz) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Motion To SS (Thompson) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted for S481/651 (SCS/1R) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-23-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (50-23-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To AS (DiMaso) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1944 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
S481 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2014 (ACS)
S481 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2014 (ACS)