NJ A2039 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S378
Note: Carry Over of previous A1952
Note: Carry Over of previous A1952
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."
Title
"Out-of-network Consumer Protection, Transparency, Cost Containment and Accountability Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S485 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.32. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-13) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-14) (Ruiz) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Motion To SS (Cardinale) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted for S485 (1R) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (48-21-3) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2039 (Carry Over) 2018-06-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.32.
A1952 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio)
S485 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2039 (1R)
A1952 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio)
S485 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A2039 (1R)