NJ A2041 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2740
Note: Carry Over of previous S1254
Note: Carry Over of previous S1254
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.97.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.97.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Bond Financing Act," authorizing issuance of bonds secured by pledge of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant proceeds, municipal liens, and special assessment; expands "Redevelopment Area Bond Financing Law;" extends time to complete certain projects under "Long Term Tax Exemption Law."
Title
Establishes "Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant Bond Financing Act," authorizing issuance of bonds secured by pledge of Economic Redevelopment and Growth Grant proceeds, municipal liens, and special assessment; expands "Redevelopment Area Bond Financing Law;" extends time to complete certain projects under "Long Term Tax Exemption Law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1840 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1840 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.97. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-5-0) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-11) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1840 (1R) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-6-0) |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2740 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
S1840 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2041 (2R)
S1254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S1840 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A2041 (2R)
S1254 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading