NJ A2089 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4016
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S824 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S824 (SCS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain drunk driving penalties; expands use of ignition interlock devices.*
Title
Revises certain drunk driving penalties; expands use of ignition interlock devices.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S824 (SCS/1R) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4016 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S824 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.248.
S824 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.248.