NJ A2106 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5863
Note: Carry Over of previous S4160
Note: Carry Over of previous S4160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S971 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S971 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Fair Play Act"; allows collegiate student-athletes to earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness.
Title
"New Jersey Fair Play Act"; allows collegiate student-athletes to earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S971 (1R) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5863 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S971 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.83.
S4160 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S971 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.83.
S4160 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading