NJ A2164 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.15.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.15.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act." *
Title
"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.15. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-16-1) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1312 (SCS/1R) |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-17-0) |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1312 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2164 (ACS/1R)