NJ A2215 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5507
Note: Carry Over of previous S3803
Note: Carry Over of previous S3803
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for certain preventive services.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for certain preventive services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5507 (Carry Over) 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.360.
S3803 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5507 (1R)
S3803 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5507 (1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2215 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2215_I1.HTM |