NJ A2280 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5425
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes certain payments for referral of patients to substance use disorder treatment facilities.
Title
Criminalizes certain payments for referral of patients to substance use disorder treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1763 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1763 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.31. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S1763 (1R) |
2020-09-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1763 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A2280 (2R)
S1763 (Same As) 2020-12-17 - Substituted by A2280 (2R)