NJ A2311 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2320
Note: Carry Over of previous A5562
Note: Carry Over of previous A5562
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.288.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.288.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes study commission to examine development of mutually beneficial relationships between institutions of higher education and municipalities.
Title
Establishes study commission to examine development of mutually beneficial relationships between institutions of higher education and municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S356 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S356 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.288. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S356 (2R) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Cryan) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S356 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A2311 (3R)
S2320 (Carry Over) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A5562 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2320 (Carry Over) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A5562 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee