NJ A2355 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2577
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-06 - Approved P.L.2020, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-06 - Approved P.L.2020, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Title
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1974 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.119. |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1974 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2577 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S1974 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A2355
S1974 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A2355