NJ A2374 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1169
Note: Carry Over of previous S1611
Note: Carry Over of previous S1611
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.201.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.201.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Directs EDA to establish program for public or private financing of certain renewable energy, water, and storm resiliency projects through use by municipalities of voluntary special assessments for certain property owners.
Title
Directs EDA to establish program for public or private financing of certain renewable energy, water, and storm resiliency projects through use by municipalities of voluntary special assessments for certain property owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1953 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1953 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-24 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.201. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (63-12-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted for S1953 (SCS/1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-6-0) |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2374 (Carry Over) 2021-08-24 - Approved P.L.2021, c.201.
S1611 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S1953 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A2374 (ACS/3R)
S1611 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S1953 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A2374 (ACS/3R)