NJ A2394 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S129
Note: Carry Over of previous A1138
Note: Carry Over of previous S840
Note: Carry Over of previous A1138
Note: Carry Over of previous S840
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies in this State to establish minority recruitment and selection programs; establishes reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S401 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S401 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.107. |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-3-5) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S401 (1R) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-3-5) |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2394 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.107.
S401 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2394 (1R)
A1138 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S840 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S401 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2394 (1R)
A1138 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S840 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee