NJ A2407 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2816
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1014 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1014 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Title
Changes composition of State Employment and Training Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S1014 (2R) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1014 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.249.
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)
S2816 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A4357 (1R)