NJ A2420 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1340
Note: Carry Foward to future S639
Note: Carry Over of previous A5190
Note: Carry Foward to future S639
Note: Carry Over of previous A5190
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain water suppliers to reimburse residential customers for drinking water testing and filters under certain circumstances. **
Title
Requires certain water suppliers to reimburse residential customers for drinking water testing and filters under certain circumstances. **
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Karabinchak) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2420 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2420 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S732 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5190 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A2420 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S732 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5190 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee