NJ A2442 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5232
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey.*
Title
Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2679 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.18. |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2679 (2R) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5232 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2679 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2442 (1R)
S2679 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2442 (1R)