NJ A2480 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3661

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S908 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies association assessment payment requirements in planned real estate developments.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies association assessment payment requirements in planned real estate developments.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18AssemblySubstituted by S908 (1R)
2020-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-03AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

S908 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-2-1)
S3661 (Carry Over) 2019-08-27 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback