NJ A2481 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2451
Note: Legislation replaced by S2050/2090
Note: Legislation replaced by S2050/2090
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2050/2090 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2050/2090 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes Armed Services combat zone pay from gross income taxation.
Title
Excludes Armed Services combat zone pay from gross income taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S2050/2090 (SCS) |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2451 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2090 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Combined with S2050 (SCS)
S2050/2090 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.93.
S2090 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Combined with S2050 (SCS)
S2050/2090 (Replaced by) 2020-09-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.93.