NJ A2487 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S989 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S989 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Healthy Terminals Act"; requires certain airport and train station workers to be paid certain wage rates and benefits.
Title
"Healthy Terminals Act"; requires certain airport and train station workers to be paid certain wage rates and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S989 (SCS) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S989 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.68.