NJ A2669 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.86.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerning certain motor vehicle ancillary production products and service contracts.
Title
Concerning certain motor vehicle ancillary production products and service contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1198 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.86. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Substituted for S1198 (1R) |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-1-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by A2669 (1R)