NJ A2821 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1183
Note: Carry Foward to future S80
Note: Carry Over of previous S971
Note: Carry Over of previous A2384
Note: Carry Foward to future S80
Note: Carry Over of previous S971
Note: Carry Over of previous A2384
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Commission on Health Insurance Network Adequacy.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Commission on Health Insurance Network Adequacy.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2821 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A2821 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1109 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S971 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2384 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A2821 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1109 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S971 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2384 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2821 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2821_I1.HTM |