NJ A2881 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3104
Note: Carry Over of previous A2381
Note: Carry Over of previous A2381
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain retailers to provide notice of FAA safety guidelines for flying drones to consumers.
Title
Requires certain retailers to provide notice of FAA safety guidelines for flying drones to consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-2-1) |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2881 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1741 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2381 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S1741 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2381 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee