NJ A2903 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5072
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S1790 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S1790 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns law regarding failure to pay wages.
Title
Concerns law regarding failure to pay wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S1790 (3R) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1790 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - Approved P.L.2019, c.212.
A5072 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
A5072 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly