NJ A3010 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides $21 minimum annual energy assistance to qualified families; qualifies families to receive additional nutritional assistance.
Title
Provides $21 minimum annual energy assistance to qualified families; qualifies families to receive additional nutritional assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 67 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S839 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S839 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-7-0) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-2) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted for S839 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-7-0) |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |