NJ A3088 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A40
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases New Jersey Earned Income Tax Credit; provides credit for child or dependent care expenses; taxes"investment management services." *
Title
Increases New Jersey Earned Income Tax Credit; provides credit for child or dependent care expenses; taxes"investment management services." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S64 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S64 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.45. |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-15) |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-20-0) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Motion Waive Rule 22:4a (51-20-0)(Jimenez) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S64/1515/2407 (SCS) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-11-7) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (51-22-0) |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bramnick) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1515 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Combined with S64/2407 (SCS)
A40 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S64 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3088 (ACS)
A40 (Carry Over) 2016-04-21 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S64 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3088 (ACS)