NJ A312 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A542
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.227.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.
Title
Requires certain health care facilities to provide information concerning palliative care and hospice care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2682 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.227. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S2682 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A542 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2682 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)
S2682 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A312 (2R)