NJ A314 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A547
Note: Carryover of previous A547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Approved P.L.2019, c.160.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts use of isolated confinement in correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts use of isolated confinement in correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3261 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.160.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-4)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S3261 (2R)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (49-24-5)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A547 (Carry Over) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by S51 (2R)
A547 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3261 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A314 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback