NJ A314 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A379
Note: Carry Foward to future S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A602
Note: Carry Over of previous S1140
Note: Carry Foward to future S1917
Note: Carry Over of previous A602
Note: Carry Over of previous S1140
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to cash payroll checks under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires financial institutions to cash payroll checks under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A314 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A314 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A602 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1193 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A314 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A602 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1193 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1140 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A314 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/314_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A314 |