NJ A3190 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S250 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by S250 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Title
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S250 (2R) |
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Land) |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S250 (Same As) 2018-08-27 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
S3169 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3169 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A3190 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A3500/3190_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A3500/3190_R1.HTM |