NJ A3207 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3096
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands option of governmental home health care agency to partner with non-governmental providers to deliver health care services.
Title
Expands option of governmental home health care agency to partner with non-governmental providers to deliver health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S1373 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1373 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.173.
S3096 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3096 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee