NJ A3221 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2313
Note: Carry Over of previous S1454
Note: Carry Over of previous A5517
Note: Carry Over of previous S1454
Note: Carry Over of previous A5517
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program authorizing lease of historic buildings and structures in State parks, forests, and wildlife management areas.
Title
Establishes program authorizing lease of historic buildings and structures in State parks, forests, and wildlife management areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3221 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S1403 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1454 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5517 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S1403 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1454 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A5517 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3221 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3221_I1.HTM |