NJ A3359 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns registration of contractors and sets criteria for responsible bidders in public work.
Title
Concerns registration of contractors and sets criteria for responsible bidders in public work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2604 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2604 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-7-0) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-10) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2604/3009 (SCS/1R) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Norcross) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-5-0) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton) |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton) |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton) |
2012-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2604 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3359 (5R)