NJ A3411 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3169
Note: Carry Over of previous A4827
Note: Carry Over of previous A4827
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes failure to return erroneous person-to-person electronic payments following proper notification.
Title
Criminalizes failure to return erroneous person-to-person electronic payments following proper notification.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3411 (Carry Over) 2020-10-08 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4827 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
A4827 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)