NJ A3607 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2270
Note: Carry Foward to future S493
Note: Carry Foward to future S962
Note: Carry Foward to future S493
Note: Carry Foward to future S962
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Community Affairs to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer a voluntary recovery residence certification program.*
Title
Requires Department of Community Affairs to approve credentialing entity to develop and administer a voluntary recovery residence certification program.*
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Serena DiMaso [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2515 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3446 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3607 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2515 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3446 (Same As) 2019-09-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading