NJ A3612 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1001
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DMVA to receive voluntary contributions for veteran suicide prevention public service announcements. *
Title
Permits DMVA to receive voluntary contributions for veteran suicide prevention public service announcements. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3612 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2573 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2573 (Same As) 2018-05-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee