NJ A3616 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Gives State lottery winners option of remaining anonymous indefinitely.
Title
Gives State lottery winners option of remaining anonymous indefinitely.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2267 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2267 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.402.