NJ A3622 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2584 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S2584 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to membership and responsibilities of Campus Sexual Assault Commission.
Title
Makes changes to membership and responsibilities of Campus Sexual Assault Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S2584 (1R) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2584 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.104.