NJ A3676 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates Garden State Growth Zone at Atlantic City International Airport and surrounding area; adjusts full-time employee designation requirements.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2307 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-03SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.120.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-7-0)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted for S2307 (2R)
2018-06-21SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-9-1)
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-05-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-03-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2307 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3676 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback