NJ A3686 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits two or more candidates for school board member to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot for same term.
Title
Permits two or more candidates for school board member to circulate petitions jointly and be bracketed together on ballot for same term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2527 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-11-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-10) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2527 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-14-0) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2527 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3686 (1R)