NJ A3745 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A176
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2469 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2469 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits person from contracting for public work if person is barred from receiving federal contract.
Title
Prohibits person from contracting for public work if person is barred from receiving federal contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S2469 (1R) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3745 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2469 (1R)
S2469 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.406.
S2469 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.406.