NJ A3756 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1147
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S1957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S1957
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports activities of New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.
Title
Supports activities of New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S1957 |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3756 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S1957
S1957 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S1957 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate