NJ A377 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S473
Note: Carry Over of previous A833
Note: Carry Over of previous A833
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospital employees to assist uninsured patients with creating account to apply for insurance coverage through Federally-Facilitated Marketplace.*
Title
Requires hospital employees to assist uninsured patients with creating account to apply for insurance coverage through Federally-Facilitated Marketplace.*
Sponsors
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-21-2) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A377 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A833 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S575 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A833 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S575 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A377 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A0500/377_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A377 |