NJ A3818 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A969
Note: Carry Foward to future S902
Note: Carry Over of previous S801
Note: Carry Foward to future S902
Note: Carry Over of previous S801
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies statutory exemptions from mandatory immunization requirements for child care center and school attendance.*
Title
Clarifies statutory exemptions from mandatory immunization requirements for child care center and school attendance.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-25-6) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3818 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)
A3818 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)
S2173 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (18-15) (Weinberg)
S801 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3818 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (17-15) (Weinberg)
S2173 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Senate Amendment (18-15) (Weinberg)
S801 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee