NJ A382 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A530
Note: Carry Foward to future S2712
Note: Carry Foward to future A4652
Note: Carry Foward to future S2468
Note: Carry Over of previous A840
Note: Carry Foward to future S2712
Note: Carry Foward to future A4652
Note: Carry Foward to future S2468
Note: Carry Over of previous A840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Title
Establishes minimum certified nurse aide-to-resident ratios in nursing homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A840 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1612 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A382 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A840 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1612 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee