NJ A3833 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1751
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S362 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S362 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that deed restrictions on affordable housing units are not extinguished by foreclosure proceedings.
Title
Provides that deed restrictions on affordable housing units are not extinguished by foreclosure proceedings.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S362 (1R) |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S362 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - Approved P.L.2019, c.132.
S1751 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1751 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee