NJ A3834 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S597
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain special law enforcement officers to be under 65 years of age.*
Title
Requires certain special law enforcement officers to be under 65 years of age.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-2-0) |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3834 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4104 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4104 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading