NJ A3836 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1459
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S700 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S700 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Higher Education Citizenship Equality Act;" defines domicile for dependent students for purpose of eligibility for State student grants and scholarships, and resident tuition rate.*
Title
"Higher Education Citizenship Equality Act;" defines domicile for dependent students for purpose of eligibility for State student grants and scholarships, and resident tuition rate.*
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S700 (3R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S700 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.383.
S1459 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1459 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee