NJ A3851 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2261
Note: Carry Foward to future A4265
Note: Carry Foward to future A4265
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law relating to common interest communities.
Title
Revises law relating to common interest communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2425 (2R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
A3851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
S2425 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A3851 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2425 (2R)
S2425 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session