NJ A3858 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2213
Note: Carry Over of previous S1934
Note: Carry Over of previous S1934
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades crime of stalking when victim is less than 18 years old.
Title
Upgrades crime of stalking when victim is less than 18 years old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3858 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1948 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1934 (Carry Over) 2014-04-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1948 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1934 (Carry Over) 2014-04-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee