NJ A3948 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3313
Note: Carry Foward to future S1973
Note: Carry Foward to future S1973
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for immediate issuance of marriage and civil union licenses; provides for 72 hour waiting period prior to the ceremony.
Title
Provides for immediate issuance of marriage and civil union licenses; provides for 72 hour waiting period prior to the ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3948 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3948 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2388 (Same As) 2016-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3948 (Carry Over) 2017-06-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2388 (Same As) 2016-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee