NJ A3956 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2332 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Substituted by S2332 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Emergency Rental Assistance Program"; appropriates $100 million.
Title
Establishes "2020 New Jersey Emergency Rental Assistance Program"; appropriates $100 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted by S2332 (1R) |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-01 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2332 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate